Kronberg v. Oasis Petroleum North America LLC et al

Defendant: Basin Concrete, Inc. and Oasis Petroleum North America LLC
Plaintiff: Margo Kronberg
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv00011
Filed: January 17, 2013
 
Court: North Dakota District Court
Office: Northwestern Office
County: Williams
Presiding Judge: Charles S. Miller
 
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Wrongful Death
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
February 20, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 3/20/2013 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (KT)
March 20, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/1/2014 at 02:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (KT)
May 8, 2014 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Status Conference re: Discovery Dispute set for 5/12/2014 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
September 10, 2014 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Extending Discovery Deadlines: Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 10/1/2014. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 11/14/2014. Expert Depositions due by 12/1/2014. Dispositive Motions that do not rely on expert reports due by 11/3/2014. Dispositive Motions that rely on expert reports due by 12/1/2014. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(KT)
September 10, 2014 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. denying 67 Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part 68 Motion to Compel; and granting in part and denying in part 74 Motion in Limine. (KT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Kronberg v. Oasis Petroleum North America LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Basin Concrete, Inc.
Represented By: Randall N. Sickler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oasis Petroleum North America LLC
Represented By: Kent A. Reierson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margo Kronberg
Represented By: Aaron W. Roseland
Represented By: Dennis E. Johnson
Represented By: Ariston Edward Johnson
Represented By: Thomas A. Dickson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]