Redford v. Willbros Group, Inc., et al

Defendant: Willbros Construction (U.S.), LLC and Willbros Group, Inc.
Plaintiff: Rosemarie Redford
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv00014
Filed: February 1, 2013
 
Court: North Dakota District Court
Office: Northwestern Office
County: McKenzie
Presiding Judge: Charles S. Miller
 
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Wrongful Death
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
March 26, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/4/2014 at 1:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
April 19, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 19 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kurt M. Jackson. (BG) NEF regenerated to Kurt Jackson on 4/19/2013. (rm)
July 17, 2014 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting in part and denying in part 26 Motion for Summary Judgment. (KT)
August 11, 2014 41 Opinion or Order of the Court (Text Only) ORDER adopting 40 Stipulation of Dismissal. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
August 21, 2014 42 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER adopting 40 Stipulation of Dismissal. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(KT)
February 22, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 3/26/2013 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Redford v. Willbros Group, Inc., et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willbros Construction (U.S.), LLC
Represented By: Joel A. Flom
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willbros Group, Inc.
Represented By: Joel A. Flom
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosemarie Redford
Represented By: Thomas A. Dickson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]