Murex Petroleum Corporation v. Phoenix Operating Company, Inc.

Defendant: Phoenix Operating Company, Inc.
Plaintiff: Murex Petroleum Corporation
Case Number: 4:2013cv00106
Filed: September 11, 2013
Court: North Dakota District Court
Office: Northwestern Office
County: Divide
Presiding Judge: Daniel L. Hovland
Referring Judge: Charles S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 13, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/27/2015 at 02:00 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(KT)
September 8, 2014 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 18 Stipulation Extend Discovery / Scheduling Plan Deadlines. Discovery due by 1/3/2015. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 12/1/2014. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 1/3/2015. Dispositive Motions due by 2/27/2015. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
November 18, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 12/13/2013 at 10:30 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murex Petroleum Corporation v. Phoenix Operating Company, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phoenix Operating Company, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Murex Petroleum Corporation
Represented By: Daniela E. Pavuk
Represented By: John W. Morrison, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]