Norris v. SM Energy Company

Plaintiff: Ashley Nicole Norris
Defendant: SM Energy Company
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv00116
Filed: September 24, 2013
 
Court: North Dakota District Court
Office: Northwestern Office
County: McKenzie
Presiding Judge: Daniel L. Hovland
Referring Judge: Charles S. Miller
 
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
November 13, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney James R. Behrenbrinker. (BG)
December 2, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/27/2015 at 01:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(KT)
March 24, 2014 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 5/20/2014 at 9:00 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
October 15, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 12/3/2013 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(KT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Norris v. SM Energy Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Nicole Norris
Represented By: Paul F. Ebeltoft
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SM Energy Company
Represented By: Lyle W. Kirmis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]