Bankhead v. Village of Newburgh Heights et al

Plaintiff: Kim Bankhead
Defendant: Village of Newburgh Heights, Bob Hoover, Joseph Szelenyi and Chris Minek
Case Number: 1:2008cv02484
Filed: October 20, 2008
Court: Ohio Northern District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: Cuyahoga
Presiding Judge: James S. Gwin
Referring Judge:
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 27, 2010 154 Opinion or Order of the Court Memorandum Opinion and Order - The motion for summary judgment of the individual defendants is hereby granted as to the plaintiff's claims of civil conspiracy, malicious prosecution, false arrest and false imprisonment, and denied as to t he balance of the claims against the individual defendants. The motion for summary judgment of the Village of Newburgh Heights is granted only on the state law claims, and denied as to the balance of the claims against it. Magistrate Judge David S. Perelman on 8/27/10. (Related Document # 94 , 95 (G,S) Modified on 8/27/2010 (G,S). Modified text on 8/30/2010 (E,P).
January 22, 2010 58 Opinion or Order of the Court Memorandum Opinion and Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Perelman on 1/22/10. (W,Jo)
February 22, 2010 65 Opinion or Order of the Court Memorandum Opinion and Order. This Court has been informed by defendants counsel that the page initially redacted from Bobby Hoovers personnel records by Wakeman Police Department has been provided to Plaintiff.This being so, there are no lon ger any outstanding issues under defendants motion to quash (Doc. # 48 ). This Court dealt with the subpoena issued to the Cleveland Clinic and that institutions motion to quash (Doc. # 40 ) in a ruling entered January 22, 2010(Doc. # 58 ), and the Northeast Ohio Regional Sewer District has responded to the subpoena issued to it.The motion will be dismissed as moot as it pertains to the subpoenas issued to the Wakeman Police Department and the Northeast Ohio Regional Sewer District, and granted as regards the subpoena issued to the Cleveland Clinic. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Perelman on 2/22/10. (W,Jo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bankhead v. Village of Newburgh Heights et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Bankhead
Represented By: John J. Spellacy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Village of Newburgh Heights
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Hoover
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Szelenyi
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Minek
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]