Sierra 76, Inc. v. TA Operating LLC

Plaintiff: Sierra 76, Inc.
Defendant: TA Operating LLC
Case Number: 1:2011cv01264
Filed: June 20, 2011
Court: Ohio Northern District Court
Office: Cleveland Office
County: Cuyahoga
Presiding Judge: Donald C. Nugent
Nature of Suit: Rent, Lease, and Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1443
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 27, 2012 20 Opinion or Order of the Court Memorandum Opinion. Defendant's Motion for summary judgment (Related doc # 15 ) and Plaintiff's cross motion for summary judgment (Related doc # 17 ) are both denied. Trial set for 3/19/2012; trial order to issue. Judge Donald C. Nugent on 1/27/2012. (H,CM)
February 24, 2012 24 Opinion or Order of the Court Memorandum Opinion and Order denying defendant's Motion for reconsideration. Related Doc # 21 . Judge Donald C. Nugent (C,KA)
April 17, 2012 46 Opinion or Order of the Court Memorandum Opinion that the Court finds in favor of the Plaintiff, Sierra 76, Inc. and against defendant TA Operating LLC in its claims. Sierra's renewal of the Casino Lease agreement is deemed effective as a matter of law, costs are assesed to the Defendant. Judge Donald C. Nugent on 4/17/12. (E,P)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sierra 76, Inc. v. TA Operating LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sierra 76, Inc.
Represented By: John E. Schiller
Represented By: Morris L. Hawk
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TA Operating LLC
Represented By: Debora S. Lasch
Represented By: T. Christopher O'Connell
Represented By: Michael R. Stavnicky
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]