Bertz et al v. Norfolk Southern Railway et al

Case Number: 3:2003cv07011
Filed: January 8, 2003
Court: Ohio Northern District Court
Office: Toledo Office
Presiding Judge: James G. Carr
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51 Railways: Fed. Employer's Liability Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 5, 2005 176 Opinion or Order of the Court Order granting defendants' Motion for summary judgment (Related Doc # 164). Signed by Judge James G. Carr on 7/5/2005.(R, Ke)
July 7, 2005 178 Opinion or Order of the Court Amended Order: Defendants' motion for summary judgment be, and the same hereby is, granted.. Signed by Judge James G. Carr on 7/7/2005. (R, Ke)
July 11, 2005 180 Opinion or Order of the Court Amended Order Defendants' motion for summary judgment be, and the same hereby is, granted.So Ordered.. Signed by Judge James G. Carr on 7/1105. (B, Be)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bertz et al v. Norfolk Southern Railway et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]