Jeter v. Sample

Plaintiff: Ravon Jeter, Sr.
Defendant: Lt. Sample
Case Number: 4:2013cv00896
Filed: April 22, 2013
Court: Ohio Northern District Court
Office: Youngstown Office
County: Mahoning
Presiding Judge: Benita Y. Pearson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 2, 2014 25 Opinion or Order of the Court Order For the reasons set forth herein, the Court adopts Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke's Report and Recommendation (ECF No. 19 ), and denies Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 9 ). Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 7/2/2014. (JLG)
December 19, 2014 33 Opinion or Order of the Court Order denying Plaintiff's Motion to Suboena of Video Recording Tape (Related Doc # 30 ). Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke on 12/19/2014.(P,G)
February 27, 2015 35 Opinion or Order of the Court Memorandum of Opinion and Order For the reasons set forth herein, the Court adopts the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation. ECF No. 34 . Defendant Lieutenant Sample's Motion for Summary Judgment is granted and Plaintiff R avon Jeter, Sr.'s Motion for Summary Judgment is denied. The Court therefore enters judgment against Plaintiff. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3), that an appeal from this decision could not be taken in good faith, and that there is no basis upon which to issue a certificate of appealability. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 2/27/2015. Related document(s) 28 , 29 , 34 . (JLG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jeter v. Sample
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ravon Jeter, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Sample
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]