Huff et al v. FirstEnergy Corp. et al

Defendant: Terrance O'Donnell, Judith Ann Lanzinger, Maureen O'Conner, Justice Lundberg-Stratton, Leila L. Vespoli, FirstEnergy Corp., Ohio Edison Company, FirstEnergy PAC FSL, John Does, Robert Cupp, Anthony J. Alexander and James F. Pearson
Plaintiff: Lisa G Huff and Reggie D Huff
Case Number: 5:2012cv02583
Filed: October 16, 2012
Court: Ohio Northern District Court
Office: Akron Office
County: Summit
Presiding Judge: Sara Lioi
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 20, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court Memorandum Opinion and Order: The Court finds as follows: plaintiff Lisa Huff is not a proper party to this action; and defendants Cupp, O'Donnell, Lanzinger, O'Connor, and Lundberg-Stratton are sua sponte dismissed from this action. Judge Sara Lioi on 2/20/2013. (P,J)
July 15, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court Opinion and Order: To the extent that the present motion to alter or amend (Doc. No. 20 ) seeks to cure the violation of Rule 11 and reinstate Lisa Huff as a party plaintiff, the motion is granted. Plaintiff Lisa Huff will be afforded fourtee n (14) days in which to amend the complaint and the opposition to defendants' dispositive motion for the sole purpose of affixing her signature to these documents. The Court will amend its February 20, 2013 opinion and order to reflect the fact that the complaint alleges that the tree at issue in the underlying state court action was located on property that was included within the easement given to Ohio Edison. To the extent that the motion seeks to prematurely litigate the merits of the present action by offering an explanation for plaintiffs' actions in the underlying state action, the motion is denied. (Related Doc # 18 ). Judge Sara Lioi on 7/15/2013. (P,J)
July 15, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court Opinion and Order (Nunc Pro Tunc): See Opinion and Order, dated July 15, 2013. (Doc. No. 26 at 433.) (Related Doc # 18 , 26 ). Judge Sara Lioi on 7/15/2013. (P,J)
September 17, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court Memorandum Opinion and Order: Plaintiffs' motion (Doc. No. 10 ) to strike FirstEnergy defendants' motion to dismiss is denied. Plaintiff Reggie Huff's motion (Doc. No. 23 ) for the Court to take judicial notice of matters out side the pleadings is denied. Plaintiffs' motion (Doc. No. 11 ) to amend is denied. FirstEnergy defendants' motion (Doc. No. 7 ) to dismiss is granted. All claims in the complaint are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Judge Sara Lioi on 9/17/2013. (P,J)
May 29, 2014 42 Opinion or Order of the Court Opinion and Order: Plaintiffs' motions to alter judgment and recuse are denied. (Related Doc # 33 , 36 ). Judge Sara Lioi on 5/29/2014.(P,J) Modified to ass opinion on 5/30/2014 (H,KR).
August 18, 2014 51 Opinion or Order of the Court Opinion and Order denying second motion of plaintiffs to vacate judgment under Rule 59(e) or to recuse. (Doc. No. 44 ). Plaintiffs have demonstrated that they are unwilling to refrain from filing patently frivolous, repetitive, and harassing documents in this case. Accordingly, the Court enjoins plaintiffs Reggie Huff and Lisa Huff from filing any new pleadings, motions, or other documents in this case, without seeking and obtaining leave of court in accordance with the following: (See O pinion). The Court may deny any motion for leave to file if the proposed filing is frivolous, vexatious, or harassing. If the motion for leave is denied, the proposed filing shall remain on the docket as a matter of public record but it will not be d eemed filed. Plaintiffs' failure to comply with the terms of this Order shall be sufficient ground for this Court to deny any motion for leave to file, and may be considered an act of contempt for which plaintiffs may be sanctioned accordingly. This restriction does not, in any way, preclude plaintiffs from filing a timely appeal to the United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit from any rulings of this Court of which plaintiffs may seek appellate review. Judge Sara Lioi on 8/18/2014. (P,J)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Huff et al v. FirstEnergy Corp. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terrance O'Donnell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judith Ann Lanzinger
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maureen O'Conner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justice Lundberg-Stratton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leila L. Vespoli
Represented By: Stephen G. Sozio
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FirstEnergy Corp.
Represented By: Stephen G. Sozio
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio Edison Company
Represented By: Stephen G. Sozio
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FirstEnergy PAC FSL
Represented By: Stephen G. Sozio
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Cupp
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony J. Alexander
Represented By: Stephen G. Sozio
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James F. Pearson
Represented By: Stephen G. Sozio
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa G Huff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reggie D Huff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]