Mitchell v. Tri-Health, Inc. et al

Defendant: Hospice Of Cincinnati, Tri-Health, Inc. and Bethesda Hospital, Inc.
Plaintiff: Matthew E. Mitchell
Case Number: 1:2011cv00318
Filed: May 16, 2011
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Cincinnati Office
County: HAMILTON
Presiding Judge: Herman J. Weber
Referring Judge: J. Gregory Wehrman
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 26, 2011 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 19 Motion for Subpoenas to be issued. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Gregory Wehrman on 10/26/11. (mtw)
June 14, 2012 27 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Wehrman. IT IS RECOMMENDED that Defendants' 25 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution should be GRANTED. Objections to R&R due by 7/2/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Gregory Wehrman on 6/13/12. (lk)
September 13, 2012 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 25 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution; adopting Report and Recommendation 27 . Case is Dismissed and Terminated on the docket of this Court. Signed by Judge Herman J. Weber on 9/13/12. (Attachments: # 1 cert.recpt) (do1)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mitchell v. Tri-Health, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hospice Of Cincinnati
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tri-Health, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bethesda Hospital, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew E. Mitchell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]