Haller v. Department of Housing and Urban Development et al

Defendant: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, Consumer Financial Protection Bureau, National Credit Union Administration, Ohio Housing Finance Agency, Ohio State of, Security and Exchange Commission, Commodity Futures Trading Commission, Department of Treasury, Securities Investor Protection Corp., North American Securities Administration Association, Unknown Defendants, Office of Thrift Supervision, Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve, MERSCORP, Inc., First Horizon Home Loans, Federal National Mortgage Association, JP Morgan Chase & Co., IBM/LBPS-Serterus, Lerner Sampson and Rothfuss, Office of the Comptroller of Currency and Department of Housing and Urban Development
Plaintiff: Daniel Haller
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv00881
Filed: December 16, 2011
 
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Cincinnati Office
County: HAMILTON
Presiding Judge: Michael R. Barrett
Referring Judge: Karen L. Litkovitz
 
Nature of Suit: Antitrust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
December 28, 2011 10 Featured Case REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that plaintiff's 8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction be Denied. ORDER that plaintiff's MOTION for a Search and Seizure Warrant is Denied. The Clerk of Court is Directed to unseal document 8 on the docket of the Court. ( Objections to R&R due by 1/17/2012). Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 12/28/2011. (art)
May 29, 2012 72 Featured Case ORDER overruling 38 Objection to Magistrate Judge Order; denying 8 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying 8 Motion for search & seizure ; adopting Report and Recommendation re 10 . Doc. 8 is to remain unsealed. Signed by Judge Sandra S Beckwith on 5/29/12. (mb)
July 10, 2012 74 Featured Case ORDER that plaintiff's 60 MOTION to Stay proceedings is Denied. Plaintiff shall have (21) days from the filing date of this Order (until 8/2/2012) in which to file a response to 61 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Commodity Futures Trading Commis sion, and 67 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Security and Exchange Commission, Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve, Office of the Comptroller of Currency, Office of Thrift Supervision, Consumer Financial Protection Bureau, Department o f Housing and Urban Development, US Department of Treasury and USA. REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that the MOTIONS to Dismiss 22 25 29 34 46 48 49 52 filed by defendants be Granted. ( Objections to R&R due by 7/27/2012). Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 7/10/2012. (art)
February 1, 2013 80 Featured Case REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that 61 MOTION to Dismiss filed by defendant Commodity Futures Trading Commission be Granted and claims against this defendant be Dismissed with prejudice; 67 MOTION to Dismiss filed by defendants US Department of Housin g and Urban Development, Office of the Comptroller of the Currency, Office of Thrift Supervision, Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System, Consumer Financial Protection Bureau, US Securities and Exchange Commission, and the US Department of the Treasury be Granted pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(5) and the claims against these defendants be Dismissed without prejudice. The claims against defendants FDIC and National Credit Union Administration be Dismissed. Objections to R&R due by 2/19/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 1/31/2013. (art)
March 4, 2013 82 Featured Case ORDER granting 61 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; granting 67 Motion to Dismiss; adopting Report and Recommendation re 80 . Signed by Judge Sandra S Beckwith on 3/4/13. (mb)
November 25, 2013 90 Featured Case ORDER denying 84 Motion for TRO; overruling objections to the report & recommendation; adopting Report and Recommendation re 85 . Signed by Judge Sandra S Beckwith on 11/25/13. (mb)
January 7, 2014 93 Featured Case ORDER denying as Moot plaintiff's 92 Motion to Strike/Act. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 1/6/2014. (art)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Haller v. Department of Housing and Urban Development et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Consumer Financial Protection Bureau
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Credit Union Administration
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio Housing Finance Agency
Represented By: William J Cole
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio State of
Represented By: Aaron D Epstein
Represented By: Erin Butcher-Lyden
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Security and Exchange Commission
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commodity Futures Trading Commission
Represented By: Nancy R Doyle
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Treasury
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Securities Investor Protection Corp.
Represented By: Matthew Joseph Horwitz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North American Securities Administration Association
Represented By: Dan L Makee
Represented By: Erin K Walsh
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Defendants
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of Thrift Supervision
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MERSCORP, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Horizon Home Loans
Represented By: Erica Franca O'Brien
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase & Co.
Represented By: Nelson Marlin Reid
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IBM/LBPS-Serterus
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lerner Sampson and Rothfuss
Represented By: Kimberlee Shay Rohr
Represented By: Rick David DeBlasis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of the Comptroller of Currency
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Housing and Urban Development
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Haller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]