Firestone Financial Corp v. AB Marketing

Defendant: AB Marketing, LLC, Darroll W Alexander and Michael W Walton
Plaintiff: Firestone Financial Corp
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00446
Filed: June 8, 2012
 
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Cincinnati Office
County: HAMILTON
Presiding Judge: Herman J. Weber
 
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
August 30, 2012 16 Featured Case TRIAL PROCEDURAL ORDER: Signed by Judge Herman J. Weber on 8/30/2012. (eb)
July 22, 2013 43 Featured Case ORDER denying 31 Motion to set deposition but without prejudice to depose the same witnesses in Massachusetts within 30 days, or alternatively, to depose the same witnesses either by telephone or video. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 7/22/13. (jl1)
June 13, 2012 5 Featured Case ORDER: Preliminary Pretrial Conference scheduled for September 7, 2012 at 10:30 a.m. Counsel to file Joint Litigation Plan by August 24, 2012. Signed by Judge Herman J. Weber on 6/13/2012. (eb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Firestone Financial Corp v. AB Marketing
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AB Marketing, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darroll W Alexander
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael W Walton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Firestone Financial Corp
Represented By: Raymond William Lembke
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]