Smith et al v. Cincinnati City of et al

Defendant: Mark Levy, Alesia M. Brown, Petitions Office of, Cincinnati City of, Connie Gallagher, Patent and Trademark Office and Diane C. Goodwyn
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Smith
Case Number: 1:2012cv00648
Filed: August 24, 2012
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Cincinnati Office
County: HAMILTON
Referring Judge: Karen L. Litkovitz
Presiding Judge: S Arthur Spiegel
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 13, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that plaintiffs' 4 MOTION to Stay is Denied; plaintiffs' 10 MOTION to consolidate is Denied; plaintiffs' 22 MOTION to trial is Denied; plaintiffs' 24 MOTION to Stay is Denied; and plaintiffs' 26 call to action is Denied. REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that plaintiffs 10 MOTION for Summary Judgment be Denied; defendants Mark Levy, City of Cincinnati, and Constance Gallagher's 11 14 15 MOTIONS to Dismiss be Granted; and plaintiffs' claims against defendants Diane C. Goodwyn, Alesia M. Brown, and the United States Patent and Trademark Office be Dismissed. ( Objections to R&R due by 3/4/2013). Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 2/13/2013. (art)
June 19, 2013 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re 28 Report and Recommendation denying 10 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 11 , 14 , and 15 Motions to Dismiss; Plaintiffs' claims against Defendants Goodwyn, Brown and the United States Patent and Trademark Office are dismissed. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 6/18/13. (Attachments: # 1 Certified Mail Receipt) (ba1)
October 4, 2013 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying plaintiff's 50 Motion for Contempt with Order with grounds, judgment, and injunction; and plaintiff's 51 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 10/3/2013. (art)
March 6, 2014 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying plaintiff's 55 second Motion to Injunction to Stay the City. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 3/6/2014. (art)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith et al v. Cincinnati City of et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Levy
Represented By: Thomas L Feher
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alesia M. Brown
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Petitions Office of
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cincinnati City of
Represented By: Jessica Leigh Powell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connie Gallagher
Represented By: W Stuart Dornette
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patent and Trademark Office
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diane C. Goodwyn
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Smith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]