Baird v. Daniels et al

Defendant: LAD Holdings, LLC, Liberty Towne Center, LLC, Steve Kelly, JACS Sportfishing, Inc., American Capital Partners, LLC, Matthew C. Daniels, BCC Rivers Crossing Power, LLC, Bear Creek Construction, LLC, Jane Doe, Weatherstone at Mason, LLC and Rivers Crossing Power, LLC
Plaintiff: Timothy Baird
Case Number: 1:2012cv00945
Filed: December 7, 2012
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Cincinnati Office
County: HAMILTON
Presiding Judge: Timothy S. Black
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1964 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 7, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STAY (Doc. 9 ). Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 2/7/2013. (mr1)
August 5, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL RELIEF FROM STAY (Doc. 15 ). Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 8/5/2013. (mr1)
January 3, 2014 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER LIFTING STAY. This Court LIFTS the stay and REOPENS the case for resolution. Defendants shall file an answer or responsive pleading within 21 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 1/3/2014. (mr1)
April 11, 2014 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTS I - IV WITHOUT PREJUDICE (Doc. 24 ). Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 4/11/2014. (mr1)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baird v. Daniels et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAD Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Benjamin G Dusing
Represented By: Angela Hayden
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Towne Center, LLC
Represented By: Benjamin G Dusing
Represented By: Angela Hayden
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Kelly
Represented By: Benjamin G Dusing
Represented By: Angela Hayden
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JACS Sportfishing, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin G Dusing
Represented By: Angela Hayden
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Capital Partners, LLC
Represented By: Benjamin G Dusing
Represented By: Angela Hayden
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew C. Daniels
Represented By: Benjamin G Dusing
Represented By: Angela Hayden
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BCC Rivers Crossing Power, LLC
Represented By: Benjamin G Dusing
Represented By: Angela Hayden
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bear Creek Construction, LLC
Represented By: Benjamin G Dusing
Represented By: Angela Hayden
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weatherstone at Mason, LLC
Represented By: Benjamin G Dusing
Represented By: Angela Hayden
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rivers Crossing Power, LLC
Represented By: Benjamin G Dusing
Represented By: Angela Hayden
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Baird
Represented By: Raymond William Lembke
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]