Jones et al v. McGrath et al

Defendant: Mark A. McGrath and Home Information Network, Inc.
Plaintiff: Keeshann Jones and James Jones
Case Number: 1:2012cv00946
Filed: December 7, 2012
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Cincinnati Office
County: WARREN
Presiding Judge: Herman J. Weber
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accomodations
Cause of Action: 42:405 Fair Housing Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 17, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court TRIAL PROCEDURAL ORDER: Signed by Judge Herman J. Weber on 5/17/2013. (eb)
August 13, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 3 Motion to Dismiss; granting 9 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. The Clerk of Courts shall file plaintiffs tendered amended complaint. Plaintiffs to show cause by 8/26/13 why their remaining FHA claim should not be dismissed as time-barred; defendants may respond by 9/9/12. Signed by Judge Herman J. Weber on 8/13/13. (do1)
December 10, 2012 2 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Preliminary Pretrial Conference scheduled for March 22, 2013 at 9:00 a.m. Counsel to file Joint Litigation Plan by March 8, 2013. Signed by Judge Herman J. Weber on 12/10/2012. (eb)
September 5, 2014 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 40 defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. This case is dismissed and terminated on the docket. Signed by Judge Herman J. Weber on 9/5/14. (mb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones et al v. McGrath et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark A. McGrath
Represented By: Steven F Stuhlbarg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Information Network, Inc.
Represented By: Steven F Stuhlbarg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keeshann Jones
Represented By: Matthew Brownfield
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Jones
Represented By: Matthew Brownfield
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]