Trustees Of The Ohio Bricklayers Pension Fund et al v. Mirage Caulking, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Trustees Of The Ohio Bricklayers Pension Fund, Trustees Of The Ohio Bricklayers Health And Welfare Fund and Trustees of the Bricklayers and Trowel Trades International Pension Fund
Defendant: Willie Reeves and Mirage Caulking, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2013cv00066
Filed: January 30, 2013
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Cincinnati Office
County: HAMILTON
Presiding Judge: Herman J. Weber
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 4, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING ERISA briefing schedule and ordering Rule 26(f) report to be filed by 4/26/13. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 4/4/13. (jl1)
February 28, 2014 33 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 22 Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Judgment on Count I of Plaintiffs' claim is entered against Defendants in the amount of $62,975.12. Judgment is also rendered on Count II, to the extent that Mirage shall submit to an audit of its books by Plaintiffs' representatives beginning 1/1/2013 until the present time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 2/28/2014. (km1)
April 23, 2014 34 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSENT JUDGMENT - the parties, having reached agreement on the remaining matters in this litigation, it is ORDERED that: (1) Judgment is granted to Plaintiffs against Defendants Willie Reeves and Mirage Caulking, Inc. jointly and severally on the C ognovit Note in the amount of $18,764.79; (2) Plaintiffs are granted judgment against Mirage Caulking, Inc. for attorney fees and costs in the amount of $16,521.50; and (3) Plaintiffs' claim for a payroll audit of the books and records of Mirage Caulking, Inc. for the period of 1/1/2009 through the present is hereby dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 4/23/2014. (km1)
April 2, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to set ERISA briefing schedule. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 4/2/13. (jl1)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trustees Of The Ohio Bricklayers Pension Fund et al v. Mirage Caulking, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees Of The Ohio Bricklayers Pension Fund
Represented By: William H Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees Of The Ohio Bricklayers Health And Welfare Fund
Represented By: William H Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Bricklayers and Trowel Trades International Pension Fund
Represented By: William H Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willie Reeves
Represented By: Thomas Russell Yocum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mirage Caulking, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Russell Yocum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.