Dorn v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Marquez Dorn
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2013cv00197
Filed: March 22, 2013
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Cincinnati Office
County: ADAMS
Presiding Judge: Susan J. Dlott
Referring Judge: Karen L. Litkovitz
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 9, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTATION ORDER granting defendant's 13 Motion for a Stay of case in light of lapse of appropriations. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 10/9/2013. (art)
February 5, 2015 23 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that the decision of the Commissioner be Reversed and Remanded for further proceedings pursuant to Sentence Four of 42 USC 405(g). Objections to R&R due by 2/23/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 2/5/2015. (art)
July 2, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER pursuant to Magistrate Judges' General Order. Plaintiff's statement of errors due to be filed by 8/15/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 7/2/2013. (art)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dorn v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marquez Dorn
Represented By: Shoshana Rivka Pehowic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: John J. Stark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]