Chattams v. Warden, Lebanon Correctional Insititution

Respondent: Warden, Lebanon Correctional Insititution
Petitioner: D'Anthony L Chattams
Case Number: 1:2013cv00205
Filed: March 26, 2013
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Cincinnati Office
County: BUTLER
Presiding Judge: Sandra S Beckwith
Referring Judge: Stephanie K. Bowman
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 28, 2014 15 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS - Although Chattams' Petition was timely filed, it should be dismissed with prejudice as his claims are procedurally defaulted (Grounds Two, Four, and Five), fail to state a claim upon which habeas corpus relief can be granted (Ground One), or are without merit (Ground Three). Because reasonable jurists would not disagree with this conclusion, Petitioner should be denied a certificate of appealability and the Court should certify to the Sixth Circuit that any appeal would be objectively frivolous. Objections to R&R due by 6/16/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R Merz on 5/28/2014. (kpf1)
June 25, 2014 18 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS - Chattams' Objections are unpersuasive. It is therefore again respectfully recommended that the Petition herein be dismissed with prejudice and Chattams be denied a certificate of appealability and leave to appeal in forma pauperis. Objections to R&R due by 7/14/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R Merz on 6/25/2014. (kpf1)
August 11, 2014 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting both Report and Recommendations [15 & 18]; overruling the objections; denying the petition; denying petitioner leave to appeal IFP. A certificate of appealability will not issue. Signed by Judge Sandra S Beckwith on 8/11/14. (mb)
August 27, 2014 23 Opinion or Order of the Court DEFICIENCY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R Merz on 8/27/2014. (kpf1)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chattams v. Warden, Lebanon Correctional Insititution
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden, Lebanon Correctional Insititution
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: D'Anthony L Chattams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]