Spruance et al v. Sunbelt et al

Plaintiff: Steve Spruance and Gale Spruance
Defendant: Sunbelt Rentals and Multiquip Inc.
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00211
Filed: March 29, 2013
 
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Cincinnati Office
County: CLINTON
Presiding Judge: Herman J. Weber
 
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
October 11, 2013 36 Featured Case TRIAL PROCEDURAL ORDER: Signed by Judge Herman J. Weber on 10/11/2013. (eb)
December 9, 2013 48 Featured Case ORDER denying as moot defendant Multiquip's 39 Motion to Compel. Plaintff's are ordered to file, within 914) days of the date of this order, and affidavit detailing their costs and expenses associated with the filing of the motion to compel. Defendant Sunbelt Rentals shall file its response, if any within (7) days of receipt of plaintiffs' affidavit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 12/9/2013. (art)
April 9, 2013 6 Featured Case ORDER: Preliminary Pretrial Conference scheduled for July 26, 2013 at 9:00 a.m. Counsel to file Joint Litigation Plan by July 8, 2013. Signed by Judge Herman J. Weber on 4/9/2013. (eb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Spruance et al v. Sunbelt et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Spruance
Represented By: David M Paris
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gale Spruance
Represented By: David M Paris
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunbelt Rentals
Represented By: G Todd Hoffpauir
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Multiquip Inc.
Represented By: Audrey K Bentz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]