Brinegar v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Debra S. Brinegar
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00228
Filed: April 5, 2013
 
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Cincinnati Office
County: CLERMONT
Presiding Judge: Michael R. Barrett
Referring Judge: Karen L. Litkovitz
 
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:1383 Review of HHS Decision
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
May 22, 2014 20 Featured Case REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that the decision of the Commissioner be Reversed and Remanded for further proceedings pursuant to Sentence Fourt of 42 USC 405(g). Objections to R&R due by 6/9/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 5/22/2014. (art)
June 16, 2014 21 Featured Case ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re 20 Report and Recommendation reversing and remanding the decision by the Commissioner. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 6/16/14. (ba1)
September 3, 2013 8 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER pursuant to Magistrate Judges' General Order concerning Social Security Appeals. Plaintiff's statement of errors due to be filed by 10/21/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 9/3/2013. (art)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Brinegar v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra S. Brinegar
Represented By: George P Montgomery
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: John J. Stark
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]