Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation v. Uforma/Shelby Business Forms, Inc. et al

Defendant: Uforma/Shelby Business Forms Inc, Samuel L Peters, Miami Systems Corporation, Autron, Inc., Bertek Systems Inc., Specialty Envelope, Inc, Trust of Samuel L. Peters, 2840 Sprouse Drive, 10001 Alliance Road, 2322 Clifton Avenue, Samuel L. Peters, LLC, Peters Ohio, LLC and Unknown Controlled Group Members of UFORMA/Shelby Business Forms, Inc.
Plaintiff: Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00266
Filed: April 22, 2013
 
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Cincinnati Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Susan J. Dlott
Referring Judge: Karen L. Litkovitz
 
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1362 ERISA
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
January 21, 2014 35 Featured Case REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that defendants' 19 MOTION to Dismiss PBGC's claims against 2840 Sprouse Drive, 10001 Alliance Road, 2322 Clifton Avenue, Samuel L. Peters, LLC, and Peters Ohio, LLC be Granted. Objections to R&R due by 2/7/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 1/21/2014. (art)
February 14, 2014 36 Featured Case ORDER by Chief Judge Susan J. Dlott ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION (Doc 35) and granting motion to dismiss (Doc. 19); defts 10001 Alliance Road, 2322 Clifton Avenue, 2840 Sprouse Drive, Peters Ohio LLC, Samuel L Peers, LLC are dismissed. (vp)
March 14, 2014 40 Featured Case ORDER granting parties Joint 39 Motion to Consolidate Case with 1:13cv898. Parties to file Rule 26(f) report by 4/4/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 3/14/2014. (art) Modified on 3/14/2014 (art).
June 13, 2014 50 Featured Case STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 6/13/2014. (art)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation v. Uforma/Shelby Business Forms, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uforma/Shelby Business Forms Inc
Represented By: Benjamin G. Stewart
Represented By: Robert M Goldich(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Mariana Gaxiola(Designation Retained)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel L Peters
Represented By: Benjamin G. Stewart
Represented By: Robert M Goldich(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Mariana Gaxiola(Designation Retained)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miami Systems Corporation
Represented By: Benjamin G. Stewart
Represented By: Robert M Goldich(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Mariana Gaxiola(Designation Retained)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Autron, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin G. Stewart
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bertek Systems Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin G. Stewart
Represented By: Robert M Goldich(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Mariana Gaxiola(Designation Retained)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specialty Envelope, Inc
Represented By: Benjamin G. Stewart
Represented By: Robert M Goldich(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Mariana Gaxiola(Designation Retained)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trust of Samuel L. Peters
Represented By: Benjamin G. Stewart
Represented By: Robert M Goldich(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Mariana Gaxiola(Designation Retained)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2840 Sprouse Drive
Represented By: Benjamin G. Stewart
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 10001 Alliance Road
Represented By: Benjamin G. Stewart
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2322 Clifton Avenue
Represented By: Benjamin G. Stewart
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel L. Peters, LLC
Represented By: Mariana Gaxiola(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Robert M Goldich(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Benjamin G. Stewart
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peters Ohio, LLC
Represented By: Mariana Gaxiola(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Robert M Goldich(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Benjamin G. Stewart
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Controlled Group Members of UFORMA/Shelby Business Forms, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation
Represented By: Karen L Morris
Represented By: Kartar Khalsa
Represented By: Israel Goldowitz
Represented By: Stuart E. Bernsen
Represented By: Stuart E Bernsen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]