Brown v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Kathleen M Brown
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2013cv00267
Filed: April 23, 2013
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Cincinnati Office
County: CLERMONT
Referring Judge: Karen L. Litkovitz
Presiding Judge: S Arthur Spiegel
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 16, 2014 24 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that the decision of the Commissioner be Affirmed and this matter be closed on the docket of the Court. Objections to R&R due by 5/5/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 4/16/2014. (art)
May 13, 2014 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 24 Report and Recommendation in all respects. The Court AFFIRMS the decision of the Commissioner denying Plaintiff disability insurance benefits, and CLOSES this matter on the docket. Signed by Judge S Arthur Spiegel on 5/13/2014. (km1)
July 2, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER pursuant to Magistrate Judges' General Order. Plaintiff's statement of errors due to be filed by 8/15/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 7/2/2013. (art)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen M Brown
Represented By: Shoshana Rivka Pehowic
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: John J. Stark
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]