Batavia Woods LLC v. Wainwright et al

Defendant: Ohio Civil Rights Commission, Latonya Springs, Housing Opportunities Made Equal (H.O.M.E.), Sharon Burson, Joan Woods, Jane Wainwright, Sharon Griffin and Anthony Corona
Plaintiff: Batavia Woods LLC
Cross_claimant: Jane Wainwright
Cross_defendant: Joyce McDowell, Charles Gang and Batavia Woods LLC
Counter_claimant: Joan Woods, Sharon Burson, Jane Wainwright, Charles Gang and Housing Opportunities Made Equal (H.O.M.E.)
Counter_defendant: Batavia Woods LLC, Charles Gang, Joyce McDowell, Sharon Burson, Jane Wainwright and Joan Woods
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00696
Filed: September 27, 2013
 
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Cincinnati Office
County: CLERMONT
Referring Judge: Karen L. Litkovitz
Presiding Judge: S Arthur Spiegel
 
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
February 24, 2014 106 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER - the Court GRANTS the Motion to Dismiss All Claims Against the State of Ohio Defendants 14 (Thirty-Sixth through Fifty-Fifth Causes of Action are hereby DISMISSED, with the Court noting the absence of a Forty-Third or Forty-Fourt h Cause of Action brought against any Defendant); DENIES AS MOOT that portion of Plaintiff Batavia Woods' Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss 25 as it relates to the State of Ohio Defendants but GRANTS that portion of it as it relates to Defendants H.O.M.E. and Latonya Springs (Twenty-Eighth, Twenty-Ninth, Thirty-Fourth (labeled in error as "Twenty-Fourth" but falling sequentially between the Thirty-Third and Thirty-Sixth Causes of Action) and Thirty-Fifth Causes of Action are hereby DISMISSED); DENIES AS MOOT the Joint Motion to Stay Discovery 101 between Plaintiff Batavia Woods and Cross-Defendant McDowell and the State of Ohio Defendants; and GRANTS Plaintiff Batavia Woods and Cross-Defendant McDowell's Motion to Remand (as filed originally 24 and as renewed 104 ) and thus REMANDS the remainder of this case to the Clermont County Court of Common Pleas. Signed by Judge S Arthur Spiegel on 2/24/2014. (km1)
February 24, 2014 107 Featured Case JUDGMENT entered by Clerk affirming Court Order 106 remanding case to Clermont County Court of Common Pleas. (km1)
December 12, 2013 80 Featured Case ORDER denying as moot defendant Charles Gang's 71 Motion to attend the deposition of co-defendant Joan Woods and to ask questions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 12/12/2013. (art)
January 17, 2014 94 Featured Case ORDER following Informal Discovery Conference held on January 17, 2014: Mr. Gang is ORDERED to appear at Room 708 on 2/27/14 at 9:00 a.m. to resume his depositions; Ms. McDowell is to be made available on both 2/18/14 and 2/24/14 for depositions to b e held at the offices of the Legal Aid Society of Cincinnati; the Parties shall submit a joint protective order to the Court on or before 1/24/14; the Motion for Protective Order 70 , Motions to limit depositions 77 and 78 , and Motion to Compel 87 are DENIED as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 1/17/14. (Attachments: # 1 Position Statements, # 2 Certified Mail Receipt) (sct1)
January 30, 2014 96 Featured Case PROTECTIVE ORDER STIPULATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 1/30/2014. (art)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Batavia Woods LLC v. Wainwright et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio Civil Rights Commission
Represented By: Carolyn E Gutowski
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Latonya Springs
Represented By: Michael Anthony Kennedy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Housing Opportunities Made Equal (H.O.M.E.)
Represented By: Michael Anthony Kennedy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon Burson
Represented By: Nancy Starke Brewer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joan Woods
Represented By: Nancy Starke Brewer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Wainwright
Represented By: Noel M Morgan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon Griffin
Represented By: Carolyn E Gutowski
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Corona
Represented By: Patrick M Dull
Represented By: Carolyn E Gutowski
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Batavia Woods LLC
Represented By: Melanie E Mize
Represented By: Lindsey L Neyra
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Jane Wainwright
Represented By: Noel M Morgan
Represented By: Noel M Morgan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Joyce McDowell
Represented By: Melanie E Mize
Represented By: Lindsey L Neyra
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Charles Gang
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Batavia Woods LLC
Represented By: Melanie E Mize
Represented By: Lindsey L Neyra
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Joan Woods
Represented By: Nancy Starke Brewer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Sharon Burson
Represented By: Nancy Starke Brewer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Jane Wainwright
Represented By: Noel M Morgan
Represented By: Molly Turner Russell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Charles Gang
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Housing Opportunities Made Equal (H.O.M.E.)
Represented By: Michael Anthony Kennedy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Batavia Woods LLC
Represented By: Melanie E Mize
Represented By: Lindsey L Neyra
Represented By: Melanie E Mize
Represented By: Lindsey L Neyra
Represented By: Melanie E Mize
Represented By: Lindsey L Neyra
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Charles Gang
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Joyce McDowell
Represented By: Melanie E Mize
Represented By: Lindsey L Neyra
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Sharon Burson
Represented By: Nancy Starke Brewer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Jane Wainwright
Represented By: Noel M Morgan
Represented By: Molly Turner Russell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Joan Woods
Represented By: Nancy Starke Brewer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]