Cornelius v. Kroger Company et al

Defendant: Donald Meece and Kroger Company
Plaintiff: Joseph Cornelius
Case Number: 1:2013cv00708
Filed: October 1, 2013
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Cincinnati Office
County: HAMILTON
Presiding Judge: Herman J. Weber
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 28, 2014 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Vacating the 3/18/2014 scheduling conference 9 that was set before the Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 2/28/2014. (art)
November 25, 2014 17 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: It is recommended that defendants' motion to dismiss 13 be GRANTED and that plaintiff's amended complaint against defendants Kroger and Meece be DISMISSED with prejudice. Objections to R&R due by 12/12/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 11/25/14. (sct1)
December 17, 2014 19 Opinion or Order of the Court DECISION AND ENTRY: (1) ADOPTING THE REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE (Doc. 17 ); (2) GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS (Doc. 13 ); (3) DISMISSING PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT (Doc. 3 ); AND (4) TERMINATING THIS CASE. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 12/17/2014. (mr1)
October 16, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Preliminary Pretrial Conference scheduled for March 7, 2014 at 9:00 a.m. Counsel to file Joint Litigation Plan by February 14, 2014. Signed by Judge Herman J. Weber on 10/16/2013. (eb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cornelius v. Kroger Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Meece
Represented By: Christopher L Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kroger Company
Represented By: Christopher L Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Cornelius
Represented By: William Bernard Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.