Johnson v. Ahmed et al

Plaintiff: James A. Johnson, III
Defendant: Faisal Ahmed, Anthony Cadogan, Rosie Clagg, Mona Parks, John Desmarais, Linnea Mahlman, John Kasich, Gary C Mohr and Gary Croft
Case Number: 1:2013cv00921
Filed: December 20, 2013
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Cincinnati Office
County: SCIOTO
Presiding Judge: Timothy S. Black
Referring Judge: Karen L. Litkovitz
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 17, 2014 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that plaintiff's 8 11 MOTIONS for appointment of counsel are Denied. REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that defendants' 8 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM be Granted. Any appeal of this matter would not be taken in good faith. This matter shall proceed against defendants Rosie Clagg and Dr. Faisal Ahmed. ( Objections to R&R due by 7/7/2014). Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 6/17/2014. (art)
July 11, 2014 21 Opinion or Order of the Court DECISION AND ENTRY ADOPTING THE REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE (Doc. 19 ). Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 7/11/2014. (mr1)
May 19, 2015 30 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 27 MOTION to Dismiss: It is Recommended that the defendant's motion to dismiss be GRANTED, this case be DISMISSED for lack of prosecution, and the Court certify that an appeal of this Court's Order would not be taken in good faith. Objections to R&R due by 6/5/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 5/18/15. (sct)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
February 5, 2014 7 Opinion or Order of the Court DECISION AND ENTRY ADOPTING THE REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE (Doc. 4 ). Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 2/5/2014. (mr1)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Ahmed et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James A. Johnson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Faisal Ahmed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Cadogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosie Clagg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mona Parks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Desmarais
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linnea Mahlman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Kasich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary C Mohr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Croft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.