Marino v. Board of Trustees of the Columbus Metropolitan Library Featured Case

Challenges library behavior code. Withdrawn complaint.

Plaintiff: Ingrid Marino
Defendant: Board of Trustees of the Columbus Metropolitan Library
 
Case Number: 2:2006cv00085
Filed: February 3, 2006
 
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Columbus Office
County: FRANKLIN
Referring Judge: Terence P Kemp
Presiding Judge: Algenon L. Marbley
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
March 27, 2006 10
MOTION to Dismiss by Plaintiff Ingrid Marino. Responses due by 4/20/2006 (jm, )
March 29, 2006 11 Featured Case
ORDER granting 10 Motion to Dismiss. This case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 3/29/2006. (cw, )
March 29, 2006 12 Featured Case
CLERK'S JUDGMENT entered pursuant to Order signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 3/29/2006. (cw, ) corrected judgment modified on 3/30/2006 (cw, ).
February 3, 2006 1
COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Ingrid Marino against Defendant Board of Trustees of the Columbus Metropolitan Library (Filing fee $ 250.00) (ds)
February 3, 2006 2
Summons Issued as to Board of Trustees of the Columbus Metropolitan Library. (dms)
February 13, 2006 3
SUMMONS Returned Executed Board of Trustees of the Columbus Metropolitan Library served on 2/8/2006, answer due 2/28/2006. (dms)
February 24, 2006 4
MOTION for More Definite Statement by Defendant Board of Trustees of the Columbus Metropolitan Library. Responses due by 3/20/2006 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Anthony, Carl)
February 27, 2006 5
RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Ingrid Marino in Opposition as to 4 Defendant's MOTION for More Definite Statement. (dms)
March 2, 2006 6
REPLY to Response to Motion re 4 MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Defendant Board of Trustees of the Columbus Metropolitan Library. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Anthony, Carl)
March 9, 2006 7
REPLY filed by Plaintiff to Defendant's Response in support of its 4 MOTION for More Definite Statement. (dms)
March 9, 2006 8
RESPONSE in Support re 4 MOTION for More Definite Statement and Memo in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings in Plaintiff's 3/9/06 Reply filed by Defendant Board of Trustees of the Columbus Metropolitan Library. (Anthony, Carl)
March 23, 2006 9 Featured Case
ORDER granting 4 Defendant's Motion for More Definite Statement. Plaintiff to file Amended Complaint within ten (10) days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Terence P Kemp on 03/23/06. (dms)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Marino v. Board of Trustees of the Columbus Metropolitan Library
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ingrid Marino
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Trustees of the Columbus Metropolitan Library
Represented By: Carl Andrew Anthony
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]