Doe et al v. Mount Vernon City School District Board Of Education et al

Plaintiff: John Doe and Jane Doe
Defendant: Mount Vernon City School District Board Of Education, Stephen Short, William White and John Freshwater
Case Number: 2:2008cv00575
Filed: June 13, 2008
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: KNOX
Presiding Judge: Gregory L Frost
Referring Judge: Norah McCann King
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 1, 2010 106 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 96 Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions; Plaintiffs' shall provide to Defendant Freshwater and Attorney Hamilton their billing records as outlined in this Opinion and Order by 6/11/10; Defendant Freshwater and Attorney Hamilton shall be given until 6/25/10 to submit payment to Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Gregory L Frost on 6/1/10. (sem1)
August 2, 2010 120 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 107 Defendant Freshwater's Motion for Reconsideration of the 6/1/10 Order. Signed by Judge Gregory L Frost on 8/2/10. (sem1)
April 6, 2010 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 60 Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 61 Defendant Freshwater's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Gregory L Frost on 4/6/10. (sem1)
April 12, 2010 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 67 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel consistent with this Opinion and Order. Defendant Freshwater is ORDERED to produce all such documents within 7 days of date of this Order. Defendant Freshwater is ORDERED to appear at a continued deposition scheduled to take place at a time convenient to all parties and counsel, but in no event later than 4/26/10. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 4/12/10. (cjb)
April 28, 2010 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 86 Defendant Freshwater's Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge Gregory L Frost on 4/28/10. (sem1)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe et al v. Mount Vernon City School District Board Of Education et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Represented By: Jessica K Philemond
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Represented By: Jessica K Philemond
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mount Vernon City School District Board Of Education
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Short
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William White
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Freshwater
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]