North American Recycling, LLC et al v. Texamet Recycling, LLC et al

Plaintiff: North American Recycling, LLC, Gerry Dallimore and Susan Dallimore
Defendant: Texamet Recycling, LLC, Greg Winski and Godaddy.com, Inc.
 
Case Number: 2:2008cv00579
Filed: June 16, 2008
 
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Assault Libel & Slander Office
County: FAYETTE
Referring Judge: Terence P Kemp
Presiding Judge: Michael H. Watson
 
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
November 17, 2010 17 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that Plaintiffs are entitled to damages in the amount of $154,500 as a result of Defendants tortious activity. Further recommending that the damages award be remitted (cancelled), with the exception of $4,500 for attorneys' fees, if Defendants meet all the conditions outlined in this Report & Recommendation. Further recommending that the Court maintain jurisdiction to monitor Defendants' compliance for a period of one (1) year. Objections to R&R due within fourteen (14) days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 11/17/2010. (kjm1)
August 10, 2012 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re 17 Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 8/10/12. (jcw1)
March 24, 2010 9 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting 8 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 3/24/10. (jk1)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: North American Recycling, LLC et al v. Texamet Recycling, LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: North American Recycling, LLC
Represented By: Richard T Robol
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerry Dallimore
Represented By: Richard T Robol
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Dallimore
Represented By: Richard T Robol
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texamet Recycling, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Winski
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Godaddy.com, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]