Georgandellis v. Holzer Clinic, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Lucas Georgandellis, MD
Defendant: Holzer Clinic, Inc., Holzer Medical Center Inc, Wayne Munro, MD, John Sullivan, MD, Michael Canady, MD, Jamaal Haddad, DO, James Phillippe, Robert Daniels and Pat Connors
Case Number: 2:2008cv00626
Filed: June 27, 2008
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Anti-Trust Office
County: GALLIA
Referring Judge: Norah McCann King
Presiding Judge: Algenon L. Marbley
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 15:1 Antitrust Litigation

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 7, 2010 103 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION: Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/25/2010 @ 02:00 PM in Chambers before Judge Algenon L. Marbley. Jury Selection set for 7/6/2010 @ 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1 - Columbus before Judge Algenon L. Marbley. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 1/7/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B) (cw)
May 4, 2010 108 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER denying 56 First MOTION for Leave to File a Memorandum in Support of his Request to be Provided Documents filed by Lucas Georgandellis, MD. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 5/04/10. (rew)
July 7, 2010 119 Opinion or Order of the Court ENTRY Dismissing case with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 07/07/2010. (cw)
June 5, 2009 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION ( Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/9/2009 11:00 AM in Chambers before Judge Algenon L. Marbley, Jury Trial set for 11/16/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1 - Columbus before Judge Algenon L. Marbley.). Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 06/05/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B) (cw, )
June 5, 2009 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 21 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 22 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 06/05/2009. (cw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Georgandellis v. Holzer Clinic, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucas Georgandellis, MD
Represented By: Alexander Morris Spater
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holzer Clinic, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holzer Medical Center Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Munro, MD
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Sullivan, MD
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Canady, MD
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamaal Haddad, DO
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Phillippe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Daniels
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pat Connors
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]