The Scooter Store, Inc. et al v. Spinlife.com, LLC

Plaintiff: The Scooter Store, Inc. and The Scooter Store, Ltd.
Defendant: Spinlife.com, LLC
Case Number: 2:2010cv00018
Filed: January 6, 2010
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Columbus Office
County: FRANKLIN
Referring Judge: Mark R. Abel
Presiding Judge: Algenon L. Marbley
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 25, 2011 104 Opinion or Order of the Court DISCOVERY OPINION & ORDER granting 98 Motion to Compel. Defendant shall depose Mr. Harrison at a time mutually convenient to all concerned in Columbus, Ohio. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 5/25/2011. (kjm1)
June 1, 2011 107 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 100 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 6/1/11. (jcw1)
December 21, 2011 140 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 99 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Plaintiffs affirmative claims for trademark infringement under the Lanham Act, 15 U.S.C. § 1125(a), and Texas state law, are hereby DISMISSED. Plaintiffs claims for unfair competition under federal and state law are also hereby DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 12/21/2011. (cw)
September 28, 2012 152 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 143 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 144 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 9/28/2012. (cw)
March 21, 2011 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OVERRULING Plaintiffs Objections (ECF No. 76) and AFFIRMS the Magistrate Judges Opinion and Order (ECF No. 71). This case therefore remains proper venued before this Court. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 03/21/2011. (cw)
March 28, 2011 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 64 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 3/28/2011. (kjm1)
April 18, 2011 94 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED OPINION AND ORDER re 92 Order on Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 04/18/2011. (cw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Scooter Store, Inc. et al v. Spinlife.com, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Scooter Store, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Scooter Store, Ltd.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spinlife.com, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]