Gardiner v. Kelowna Flightcraft, Ltd

Plaintiff: Karen Gardiner
Defendant: Kelowna Flightcraft, Ltd
Case Number: 2:2010cv00947
Filed: October 19, 2010
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Columbus Office
County: FRANKLIN
Referring Judge: Terence P Kemp
Presiding Judge: Michael H. Watson
Nature of Suit: Airplane Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 23, 2011 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 42 Motion to Compel. However, the Court is mindful of the wishes of Plaintiff that the settlement agreement remain confidential. The parties are ORDERED to, w/in ten (10) days of the date of this order, prepare and submit to Magistr ate Judge Abel's chambers a draft protective order which will address the means by which the settlement agreement is to be kept confidential in this proceeding. Upon the Court's entry of protective order, Plaintiff is ORDERED to produce the settlement agreement she reached with Air Tahoma. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 05/23/2011. (sr)
June 6, 2011 68 Opinion or Order of the Court DISCOVERY ORDER: The Court Grants Kelowna's motion to compel # 44 IN PART. Plaintiff is hereby ORDERED to produce the materials cited by Donald E. Sommer as items reviewed in the expert report he produced in Gardiner v. Air Tahoma, Inc. She is hereby ORDERED to produce the materials cited by Rodney Doss as items reviewed in the expert report he produced in Gardiner v. Air Tahoma, Inc. She is further ORDERED to produce the deposition exhibits from the 10/22/2010 and 11/23/2010 depositions of Rodney Doss in Gardiner v. Air Tahoma. Plaintiff's motion for leave to file a sur-reply addressing sanctions # 58 is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 06/06/2011. (sr)
August 5, 2011 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 81 Motion by the United States to Intervene. The United States is permitted to intervene in this matter, and the Clerk is directed to enter Attachment 1 to Doc. 81 onto the docket. Plaintiff and Defendant shall have 14 days from the date of this Order to respond to the United States brief. Signed by Judge Edmund A Sargus on 08/04/2011. (dh1)
September 6, 2011 93 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting 14 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to State Court. This action is remanded to the Court of Common Pleas of Franklin County. Signed by Judge Edmund A Sargus on 09/06/2011. (dh1)
September 6, 2011 94 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT is entered pursuant to the Opinion and Order filed 09/06/2011. This case is closed. (dh1)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gardiner v. Kelowna Flightcraft, Ltd
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Gardiner
Represented By: Basil J Musnuff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelowna Flightcraft, Ltd
Represented By: Edward Reilley Forman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]