Kilroy v. Husted

Plaintiff: John P Kilroy
Defendant: Jon Husted
 
Case Number: 2:2011cv00145
Filed: February 17, 2011
 
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Columbus Office
County: FRANKLIN
Presiding Judge: Gregory L Frost
Referring Judge: Terence P Kemp
 
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Constitutionality of State Statute(s)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 2, 2011 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 13 Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Judge Gregory L Frost on 8/2/11. (sem1)
August 24, 2011 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 29 Non-Parties' Motion to Quash Subpoenas. Signed by Judge Gregory L Frost on 8/24/11. (sem1)
November 18, 2011 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 64 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Gregory L Frost on 11/18/11. (sem1)
April 16, 2012 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 74 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and denying as moot 19 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Gregory L Frost on 4/16/12. (sem1)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Kilroy v. Husted
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John P Kilroy
Represented By: Sandhya Gupta
Represented By: Subodh Chandra
Represented By: Donald P Screen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Husted
Represented By: Richard Nicholas Coglianese
Represented By: Michael Joseph Schuler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]