Palmer et al v. Tri-Star Energy Holdings, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Charles E Palmer and Vicki Palmer
Defendant: Tri-Star Energy Holdings, Inc., Gulfport Energy Corporation, Wishgard LLC, Axebridge Energy LLC, Windsor Ohio, LLC and Rhino Exploration, LLC
Case Number: 2:2012cv00178
Filed: February 27, 2012
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Columbus Office
County: BELMONT
Referring Judge: Mark R. Abel
Presiding Judge: Michael H. Watson
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 8, 2012 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Gregory Krock's request to serve as trial counsel w/out local counsel is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 3/8/12. (sh1)
November 30, 2012 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: the December 13, 2012 settlement week mediation is "CANCELLEED"; a copy of this order is to be mailed/emailed to Jerry Eichenberger mediator, 6099 Frantz Rd., Dublin OH 43217. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 11/30/12. (sh1)
May 20, 2013 62 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER denying 48 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, 49 Motion to Dismiss, 51 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, 52 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim & 53 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 5/20/2013. (kk2)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Palmer et al v. Tri-Star Energy Holdings, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles E Palmer
Represented By: Tracey J Lancione Lloyd
Represented By: Richard Lee Lancione
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vicki Palmer
Represented By: Tracey J Lancione Lloyd
Represented By: Richard Lee Lancione
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tri-Star Energy Holdings, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gulfport Energy Corporation
Represented By: Melanie Morgan Norris
Represented By: Michelle Lee Dougherty
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wishgard LLC
Represented By: Gregory J Krock
Represented By: Kate R Paine
Represented By: Timothy P Palmer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Axebridge Energy LLC
Represented By: Kyle Walter Bickford
Represented By: Michael P. McCormick
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Windsor Ohio, LLC
Represented By: Michelle Lee Dougherty
Represented By: Melanie Morgan Norris
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhino Exploration, LLC
Represented By: John Robert Estadt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]