Siegler v. City of Columbus et al

Defendant: City of Columbus, Michael Coleman, Columbus Metropolitan Housing Authority, John Waddy, John Kasich, Jason Brad Nelson and Sarah Marie Nelson
Plaintiff: Sara Elizabeth Siegler
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv00472
Filed: May 31, 2012
 
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Columbus Office
County: FRANKLIN
Referring Judge: Norah McCann King
Presiding Judge: Algenon L. Marbley
 
Nature of Suit: Housing/Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
April 29, 2013 24 Featured Case ORDER denying 17 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 4/29/13. (rew)
March 19, 2014 47 Featured Case ORDER denying 41 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 12-472. (cw)
October 9, 2012 4 Featured Case REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that re 1 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis be DENIED. Plaintiffs motion to seal 3 is GRANTED. Objections to R&R due by 10/26/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 10/09/12. (rew)
November 27, 2012 7 Featured Case ORDER OVERRULING 5 Plaintiff's Objections, The Report and Recommendation, Doc. No. 4 , is MODIFIED to include the dismissal of the claims against defendant City of Columbus. In all other respects, the Report and Recommendation is ADOPTED and AFFIRMED. The claims against defendants City of Columbus, Mayor Michael Coleman, John Waddy, Ohio Governor John Kasich, Jason Brad Nelson and Sarah Marie Nelson are DISMISSED for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Plaintiff is DIRECTED to pay the full $350.00 filing fee within thirty (30) days. Plaintiff is ADVISED that her failure to do so will result in the dismissal of the action for failure to prosecute.. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 11/27/2012. (cw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Siegler v. City of Columbus et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Columbus
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Coleman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Columbus Metropolitan Housing Authority
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Waddy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Kasich
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Brad Nelson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah Marie Nelson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sara Elizabeth Siegler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]