Huntington National Bank v. Guishard, Wilburn & Shorts, LLC et al

Defendant: John - Does 1-10, Guishard, Wilburn & Shorts, LLC, Allen J Pendergrass, Nathan Pendergrass, Joseph Gray and Clyde Parks
Plaintiff: Huntington National Bank
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv01035
Filed: November 8, 2012
 
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Columbus Office
County: FRANKLIN
Referring Judge: Mark R. Abel
Presiding Judge: Algenon L. Marbley
 
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1964 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
November 26, 2012 17 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 11/26/2012. (cw)
June 3, 2013 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Plf's Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures extended to 6/17/13. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 6/3/13. (sh1)
July 31, 2013 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 48 Motion to Stay discovery deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 7/31/13. (sh1)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Huntington National Bank v. Guishard, Wilburn & Shorts, LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John - Does 1-10
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guishard, Wilburn & Shorts, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allen J Pendergrass
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathan Pendergrass
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Gray
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clyde Parks
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Huntington National Bank
Represented By: Albert Grant Lin
Represented By: John Patrick Gilligan
Represented By: Ross R. Fulton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]