Poplawski v. Commissioner of Internal Revenue Service et al

Plaintiff: Ted A. Poplawski
Defendant: Commissioner of Internal Revenue Service, Dennis Parizek, Larry K Everson, Maureen Green and Maureen Judge
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv01096
Filed: November 28, 2012
 
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Columbus Office
County: FRANKLIN
Presiding Judge: James L Graham
Referring Judge: Norah McCann King
 
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
June 4, 2013 17 Featured Case ORDER granting 16 motion to vacate. The Clerk is DIRECTED to place the attachment to Doc. No. 16 under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 6/04/13. (rew)
July 29, 2013 20 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER denying 11 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying 11 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge James L Graham on 7/29/13. (ds)
May 5, 2014 37 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER granting 28 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James L Graham on 5/5/2014. (ds)
May 5, 2014 38 Featured Case JUDGMENT. (ds)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Poplawski v. Commissioner of Internal Revenue Service et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ted A. Poplawski
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Internal Revenue Service
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Parizek
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry K Everson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maureen Green
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maureen Judge
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]