Cardinal Health 200, LLC v. Allscripts, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Cardinal Health 200, LLC
Defendant: Allscripts, LLC, Allscripts Healthcare, LLC and Allscripts Healthcare Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2013cv00305
Filed: April 2, 2013
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Columbus Office
County: FRANKLIN
Referring Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Presiding Judge: Algenon L. Marbley
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 13, 2013 30 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 16 MOTION to Dismiss & 25 MOTION for Attorney Fees: The Magistrate Judge RECOMMENDS that this Court REMAND thia action to the Franklin County Court of Common Pleas Civil Division, Ohio; GRANT IN PART AND DENY IN PART Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees; and DENY AS MOOT Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Objections to R&R due within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Report. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 8/13/2013. (er1)
October 2, 2013 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REMANDING this case to the Franklin County Court of Common Pleas, Civil Division, Ohio. Denying as moot 16 Motion to Dismiss. The Court retains limited jurisdiction to resolve the objections the U.S. Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation (Doc. 30) concerning Plaintiff's Motion for Costs and Fees (Doc. 25). Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 10/2/2013. (cw)
March 12, 2014 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re 30 Report and Recommendations; OVERRULING 33 Defendants' Objections; granting in part and denying in part 25 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 3/12/2014. (cw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cardinal Health 200, LLC v. Allscripts, LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cardinal Health 200, LLC
Represented By: William Glover Porter, II
Represented By: Martha Brewer Motley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allscripts, LLC
Represented By: Sean T Needham
Represented By: Crystal L Maluchnik
Represented By: Steven G Janik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allscripts Healthcare, LLC
Represented By: Sean T Needham
Represented By: Crystal L Maluchnik
Represented By: Steven G Janik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allscripts Healthcare Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Crystal L Maluchnik
Represented By: Steven G Janik
Represented By: Sean T Needham
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]