Thornton & Roshon Properties, Inc. v. Taylor Building Products, Inc. et al

Defendant: CNA Solution, Inc., Taylor Building Products, Inc., Chubb Group of Insurance Companies, Great Northern Insurance Company and National Fire Insurance of Hartford
Plaintiff: Thornton & Roshon Properties, Inc.
Receiver: Bill Frazier
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00309
Filed: April 3, 2013
 
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Columbus Office
County: FAIRFIELD
Referring Judge: Mark R. Abel
Presiding Judge: James L Graham
 
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
December 4, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER denying 12 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. The Court notes that National Fire identified other alleged indispensable parties but did not support their assertion of indispensability with any argument or facts to satisfy its burden as the moving party. Accordingly, defendants motion to dismiss (doc. 12) is DENIED. Signed by Judge James L Graham on 12/4/2013. (ds)
February 6, 2014 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Defendants must make their Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures by 4/14/14. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 2/6/14. (sem1)
August 12, 2014 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Counsel should jointly provide me with their schedule for depositions on or before August 22, 2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 8/12/2014. (Abel, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Thornton & Roshon Properties, Inc. v. Taylor Building Products, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CNA Solution, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Andrew Sway
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor Building Products, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chubb Group of Insurance Companies
Represented By: Donald G Drinko
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great Northern Insurance Company
Represented By: Donald G Drinko
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Fire Insurance of Hartford
Represented By: Michael Andrew Sway
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thornton & Roshon Properties, Inc.
Represented By: D. Joe Griffith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Receiver: Bill Frazier
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]