Doe v. Bollaert et al

Defendant: Blue Mist Media, LLC, Amy L. Chanson, Roy E. Chanson, Eric S. Chanson, Kevin C. Bollaert and John Roe
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00486
Filed: May 21, 2013
 
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Columbus Office
County: PERRY
Referring Judge: Mark R. Abel
Presiding Judge: Gregory L Frost
 
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
October 10, 2013 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to correct various docket entries, terminating as moot 28 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike and scheduling an In-Court Hearing for 10/21/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 - Columbus before Judge Gregory L Frost regarding 27 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Gregory L Frost on 10/10/13. (sem1)
October 22, 2013 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER terminating 51 Defendants Roy and Amy Chanson's Motion to consider why they felt to need to employ ghostwriters; striking 9 Defendants Roy and Amy Chanson's Motion to Dismiss; striking 12 Defendant Eric Chanson's Motion to Dismiss; striking 16 Defendants Roy and Amy Chanson's Motion for Sanctions; denying as moot 23 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File a Sur-Reply; granting in part and denying in part 27 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike, or in the alternative, Motion to Show Cause. Signed by Judge Gregory L Frost on 10/22/13. (sem1)
March 12, 2014 73 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER denying 62 Rule 12(c) Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Gregory L Frost on 3/12/2014. (kk2)
March 18, 2014 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 67 Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment against Defendants Kevin C. Bollaert and Eric S. Chanson, jointly and severally, in the amount of $385,000.00. Signed by Judge Gregory L Frost on 3/18/14. (sem1)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Doe v. Bollaert et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Mist Media, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy L. Chanson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roy E. Chanson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric S. Chanson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin C. Bollaert
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Roe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Represented By: Henry Louis Sirkin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]