Orrand et al v. Sanjects Group LLC

Defendant: Sanjects Group LLC
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Ohio Operating Engineers Health & Welfare Plan, Ohio Operating Engineers Pension Fund, Ohio Operating Engineers Apprenticeship Fund, Ohio Operating Engineers Education & Safety Fund and Raymond Orrand
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00504
Filed: May 24, 2013
 
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Columbus Office
County: FRANKLIN
Referring Judge: Norah McCann King
Presiding Judge: George C Smith
 
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:1145 E.R.I.S.A.
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
January 22, 2014 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 21 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Judge George C Smith on 1/22/14. (lvw1)
May 15, 2014 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 23 MOTION for Order to Show Cause . Objections to R&R due by 6/2/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 5/14/2014. (pes1)
June 24, 2014 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS, Motions terminated: 27 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 23 Denying MOTION for Order to Show Cause filed by Raymond Orrand, Trustees of the Ohio Operating Engineers Health & Welfare Plan, Oh io Operating Engineers Pension Fund, Ohio Operating Engineers Apprenticeship Fund, 23 MOTION for Order to Show Cause filed by Raymond Orrand, Trustees of the Ohio Operating Engineers Health & Welfare Plan, Ohio Operating Engineers Pension Fund, Ohio Operating Engineers Apprenticeship Fund, Ohio Operating Engineers Education & Safety Fund.. Signed by Judge George C Smith on 6/24/14. (lvw1)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Orrand et al v. Sanjects Group LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanjects Group LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Ohio Operating Engineers Health & Welfare Plan, Ohio Operating Engineers Pension Fund, Ohio Operating Engineers Apprenticeship Fund, Ohio Operating Engineers Education & Safety Fund
Represented By: Bryan Charles Barch
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Orrand
Represented By: Bryan Charles Barch
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]