Brooks v. Potter et al

Defendant: Michelle Miller, Mary Potter, Jhon Doe, T. Buchannon and State of Ohio
Plaintiff: Gordon Brooks
Case Number: 2:2013cv00507
Filed: May 24, 2013
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Columbus Office
County: ALLEN
Presiding Judge: Gregory L Frost
Referring Judge: Norah McCann King
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 18, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order: The Magistrate Judge RECOMMENDS that the Motion be DENIED. Objections to R&R due within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Report. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 9/18/2013. (er1)
October 29, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING the REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 24 in that the Motion for an Emergency Temporary Protection Order filed by Gordon Brooks is DENIED. Signed by Judge Gregory L Frost on 10/29/13. (sem1)
November 22, 2013 30 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that the claims against the remaining defendants be dismissed for failure to effect of process. It is further recommended that this action be dismissed. Objections due w/in fourteen (14) days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 11/22/2013. (kk2)
December 12, 2013 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING the REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 28 30 in that the 22 23 Motions to Dismiss Defendants Mary Potter and Michelle Miller are GRANTED. This case is DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Gregory L Frost on 12/12/13. (sem1)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brooks v. Potter et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Miller
Represented By: Judith B Goldstein
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Potter
Represented By: Judith B Goldstein
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jhon Doe
Represented By: Judith B Goldstein
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Buchannon
Represented By: Judith B Goldstein
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Ohio
Represented By: Judith B Goldstein
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gordon Brooks
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]