Cranel, Incorporated v. Pro Image Consultants Group, LLC et al

Defendant: Pro Image Consultants Group, LLC, Richard Morin and Frank Damico
Plaintiff: Cranel, Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2013cv00766
Filed: August 1, 2013
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Columbus Office
County: DELAWARE
Referring Judge: Mark R. Abel
Presiding Judge: James L Graham
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 26, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court AGREED ORDER COMPELLING DEFENDANTS TO PRESERVE EVIDENCE AND ENJOINING DEFENDANTS' FROM DESTRUCTION OF EVIDENCE. The parties have agreed to resolve the matters raised in Cranel's Motion through an agreed order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 12/26/2013. (sr1)
December 9, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part 8 Motion to Stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 12/9/13. (jcw1)
December 11, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 12/11/2013. (sr1)
July 17, 2014 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 54 Motion for Protective Order and denying 54 Motion to Stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 07/17/2014. (sr1)
September 29, 2014 59 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting 39 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting 40 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting 42 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge James L Graham on 9/29/2014. (ds)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cranel, Incorporated v. Pro Image Consultants Group, LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pro Image Consultants Group, LLC
Represented By: Maribeth Deavers
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Morin
Represented By: Maribeth Deavers
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Damico
Represented By: Maribeth Deavers
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cranel, Incorporated
Represented By: Christen Marie Blend
Represented By: Scott Edward North
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]