National City Mortgage Co v. International Home Capital Corporation

Case Number: 3:2004cv00426
Filed: December 8, 2004
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Dayton Office
Presiding Judge: Thomas M Rose
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 25, 2012 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO FILE STATUS REPORT WITHIN FOURTEEN (14) DAYS. Signed by Judge Thomas M Rose on 7/25/12. (ep)
September 3, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER LIFTING STAY AND ORDER TO PLAINTIFF TO PROSECUTE SAID CASE OR SHOW CAUSE WHY CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE. ( Show Cause Response due by 9/17/2013.). Signed by Judge Thomas M Rose on 9/3/13. (ep)
September 27, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Thomas M Rose on 9/27/13. (ep)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National City Mortgage Co v. International Home Capital Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]