United States of America v. Account Contents of PNC Bank, Acct 0482 et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Account Contents of PNC Bank, Acct 0482, Account Contents of PNC Bank, Acct 0212, Account Contents of PNC Bank, Acct 0204, Account Contents of PNC Bank, Acct 2997, $2,661.00 U.S. Currency, $207.00 U.S. Currency, $182.00 U.S. Currency, 2002 Lexus LX470 VIN JTJHT00W523513550 and Miscellaneous Jewelry
Claimant: Elias J Daoud, George Daoud and Lama J.B. Daoud
 
Case Number: 3:2012cv00231
Filed: July 12, 2012
 
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Dayton Office
County: MONTGOMERY
Presiding Judge: Thomas M Rose
 
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: Civil Miscellaneous Case
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
November 6, 2012 23 Opinion or Order of the Court AGREED ORDER AND DECREE OF FORFEITURE OF DEFENDANTS 1-7 and 9 granting 20 Motion. Signed by Judge Thomas M Rose on 11/06/12. (pb1)
December 18, 2012 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STRIKING CLAIM OF CLAIMANT KRYSTAL CAR COMPANY, INC.TO DEFENDANT (8) 2002 LEXUS granting 24 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Thomas M Rose on 12/18/12. (pb1)
February 25, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT AND DECREE OF FORFEITURE AGAINST DEFENDANT (8) 2002 LEXUS LX470. Signed by Judge Thomas M Rose on 02/25/13. (pb1)
July 17, 2012 3 Opinion or Order of the Court WARRANT OF ARREST IN REM. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 7/16/12. (mr1)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: United States of America v. Account Contents of PNC Bank, Acct 0482 et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Pamela M Stanek
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Account Contents of PNC Bank, Acct 0482
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Account Contents of PNC Bank, Acct 0212
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Account Contents of PNC Bank, Acct 0204
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Account Contents of PNC Bank, Acct 2997
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $2,661.00 U.S. Currency
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $207.00 U.S. Currency
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $182.00 U.S. Currency
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2002 Lexus LX470 VIN JTJHT00W523513550
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miscellaneous Jewelry
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Elias J Daoud
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: George Daoud
Represented By: Jon Paul Rion
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Lama J.B. Daoud
Represented By: Ian N Friedman
Represented By: Kristina Walter Supler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]