Board of Commissioners of Montgomery County, Ohio, on behalf of Montgomery County, Ohio v. Federal Housing Finance Agency et al

Plaintiff: Board of Commissioners of Montgomery County, Ohio, on behalf of Montgomery County, Ohio
Defendant: Federal Housing Finance Agency, Federal National Mortgage Association and Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation
Case Number: 3:2012cv00245
Filed: July 25, 2012
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Dayton Office
County: MONTGOMERY
Presiding Judge: Thomas M Rose
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 26, 2012 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 20 Motion. Signed by Judge Thomas M Rose on 11/26/12. (pb1)
February 28, 2013 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 40 Motion to Certify Class R. 40. Signed by Judge Thomas M Rose on 2/28/13. (kje1)
April 8, 2013 52 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSENT ORDER APPROVING PLAN OF NOTICE AND FORM OF NOTICE. Signed by Judge Thomas M Rose on 4/8/13. (kje1)
October 23, 2013 74 Opinion or Order of the Court [**SEE AMENDED ENTRY AND ORDER FILED AT DOC. 75 TO CORRECT CASE NUMBER***] ORDER granting 24 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and 64 Amended Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 10/23/2013. (jab) Modified on 10/23/2013 (de).
October 23, 2013 76 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT with Attached Notice of Disposal. Signed on 10/23/13. (pb1)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Board of Commissioners of Montgomery County, Ohio, on behalf of Montgomery County, Ohio v. Federal Housing Finance Agency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Commissioners of Montgomery County, Ohio, on behalf of Montgomery County, Ohio
Represented By: William Peter Butterfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Housing Finance Agency
Represented By: Margaret A Schutte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association
Represented By: Margaret A Schutte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Margaret A Schutte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.