Yontz v. Dole Fresh Vegetables, Inc.

Plaintiff: Jeffrey S. Yontz
Defendant: Dole Fresh Vegetables, Inc.
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00066
Filed: March 4, 2013
 
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Dayton Office
County: CLARK
Presiding Judge: Thomas M Rose
 
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2617 Family and Medical Leave Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
February 4, 2014 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - The discovery phase of this case has ended. No discovery motion or other matter referred to the undersigned Judicial Officer remains pending. The case is presently set for further proceedings, including trial, before United States District Ju dge Thomas M. Rose. The Clerk of Courts, therefore, is directed to note in the record that: 1. Referral of this case to the undersigned Judicial Officer has expired; and 2. No motion or other matter in this case remains pending before the undersigned Judicial Officer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J Newman on 020414. (pb1)
February 13, 2014 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 12 Preliminary Pretrial Order. Summary Judgment Motions due by 4/15/2014. Signed by Judge Thomas M Rose on 2/13/14. (ep)
October 10, 2014 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ENTRY and ORDER denying 44 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Thomas M Rose on October 10, 2014. (jab)
June 10, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ENTRY AND ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT, DOLE FRESH VEGETABLES, INC.'S MOTION TO STRIKE SPECIFIC PARAGRAPHS IN PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT. (DOC. 7 ). Signed by Judge Thomas M Rose on 6/10/13. (kje1)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Yontz v. Dole Fresh Vegetables, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey S. Yontz
Represented By: Karen T Dunlevey
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dole Fresh Vegetables, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]