Myers et al v. The Board of Trustees of the Bricklayers and Masons Local 22 Pension Plan

Defendant: The Board of Trustees of the Bricklayers and Masons Local 22 Pension Plan, Bricklayers and Trowel Trades International Pension Fund, The Board of Trustees of Bricklayers and Trowel Trades International Pension Fund and Bricklayers and Masons Local 22 Pension Plan
Plaintiff: Kenneth L Myers and Kim Myers
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00075
Filed: March 11, 2013
 
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Dayton Office
County: MONTGOMERY
Presiding Judge: Walter H Rice
 
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
November 25, 2013 39 Featured Case DECISION AND ENTRY OVERRULING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENAS 36 Motion to Quash. Signed by Judge Walter H Rice on 11/25/13. (pb1)
November 25, 2013 40 Featured Case DECISION AND ENTRY SUSTAINING DEFENDANTS BRICKLAYERS AND TROWEL TRADES INTERNATIONAL PENSION FUND AND THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE BRICKLAYERS AND TROWEL TRADES INTERNATIONAL PENSION FUNDS MOTION TO DISMISS THE AMENDED COMPLAINT (DOC. # 24 ); CONFERENCE CALL SET WITH COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS AND REMAINING DEFENDANTS ( Telephone Conference set for 12/9/2013 at 8:30 AM before Judge Walter H Rice.) Signed by Judge Walter H Rice on 11/25/2013. (jdf1)
June 27, 2014 56 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (DOCS. ## 41 AND 43 ); OBJECTIONS TO PROPOSED PROCEDURE TO BE FILED WITHIN SEVEN DAYS. Signed by Judge Walter H Rice on 06/26/14. (pb1)
July 15, 2014 59 Featured Case ORDER: DECISION AND ENTRY SUSTAINING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT 41 AND OVERRULING DEFENDANT BRICKLAYERS AND MASONS LOCAL 22 PENSION PLAN AND THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE BRICKLAYERS AND MASONS LOCAL 22 PENSION PLANS' MOTION F OR SUMMARY JUDGMENT 43 CONSTRUED BY THE COURT AS CROSS-MOTIONS FOR JUDGMENT ON THE ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD; OVERRULING PLAINTIFFS' OBJECTION 57 AWARDING PLAINTIFF DISABILITY RETIREMENT BENEFITS RETROACTIVE TO THE DATE THEY ACCRUED UNDER THE PLAN, ALONG WITH ATTORNEY'S FEES AND EXPENSES; PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT APPLICATION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES AND EXPENSES WITHIN 30 DAYS; CASE TO REMAIN ON COURT'S ACTIVE DOCKET.. Signed by Judge Walter H Rice on 07/14/2014. (ead1)
July 15, 2014 60 Featured Case CERTIFICATION OF DECISION AND ENTRY, DOC. # 59 , UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 54(b); ORDER DIRECTING ENTRY OF JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFFS AND AGAINST DEFENDANT BRICKLAYERS AND MASONS LOCAL 22 PENSION PLAN AND THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE BRICKLAYERS AND MASONS LOCAL 22 PENSION PLAN. Signed by Judge Walter H Rice on 7/15/2014. (jdf1)
July 15, 2014 61 Featured Case JUDGMENT in favor of Kenneth L Myers, Kim Myers against Bricklayers and Masons Local 22 Pension Plan and The Board of Trustees of the Bricklayers and Masons Local 22 Pension Plan. Signed on 7/15/2014.(Notice of Disposal attached.) (jdf1)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Myers et al v. The Board of Trustees of the Bricklayers and Masons Local 22 Pension Plan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Board of Trustees of the Bricklayers and Masons Local 22 Pension Plan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bricklayers and Trowel Trades International Pension Fund
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Board of Trustees of Bricklayers and Trowel Trades International Pension Fund
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bricklayers and Masons Local 22 Pension Plan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth L Myers
Represented By: Konrad Kuczak
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Myers
Represented By: Konrad Kuczak
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]