McGrew v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration

Plaintiff: James McGrew
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00118
Filed: April 17, 2013
 
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Dayton Office
County: MONTGOMERY
Referring Judge: Sharon L Ovington
Presiding Judge: Thomas M Rose
 
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
April 8, 2014 14 Featured Case REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS - IT THEREFORE IS RECOMMENDED THAT: 1. The Commissioners non-disability finding be vacated; 2. No finding be made as to whether Plaintiff was under a disability; 3. this case be remanded to the Commissioner and the ALJ under Sentence Four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g); and, 4. the case be terminated on the docket of this Court. Objections to R&R due by 4/25/2014. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Sharon L Ovington on 4/8/2014. (rms)
April 28, 2014 15 Featured Case DECISION AND ENTRY adopting 14 Report and Recommendations - The Report and Recommendations filed on April 8, 2014 (Doc. #14) is ADOPTED in full, the Commissioner's non-disability finding is vacated, no finding is made as to whether Plaintiff James McGrew was under a disability within the meaning of the Social Security Act, this case is remanded to the Commissioner and the Administrative Law Judge under Sentence Four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g) for further consideration consistent with this Decision and Entry and the Report and Recommendations; and the case is terminated on the docket of this Court. Signed by Judge Thomas M Rose on 4-28-2014. (de)
April 28, 2014 16 Featured Case CLERK'S JUDGMENT WITH NOTICE OF DISPOSAL ATTACHED. Signed on 4/28/14. (ep)
July 25, 2014 18 Featured Case DECISION AND ORDER -The parties' Joint Stipulation to Award Attorneys Fees Under The Equal Access To Justice Act 17 is accepted, and Defendant shall pay Plaintiff's attorney fees, costs, and expenses under 28 U.S.C. Section 2412 in the to tal amount of $4,500.00, Defendant shall verify, within thirty days of this Decision and Entry, whether or not Plaintiff owes a pre-existing debt to the United States subject to offset. If no such pre-existing debt exists, Defendant shall pay the EAJA award directly to Plaintiffs attorney, and this case remains terminated on the docket of this Court. re 17 Stipulation filed by Commissioner of Social Security Administration. Signed by Judge Thomas M Rose on 7-25-2014. (de)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: McGrew v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James McGrew
Represented By: Gary Marc Blumenthal
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Represented By: John J. Stark
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]