Call v. Riverside, City of et al

Defendant: Matthew Jackson, Harold Jones, Riverside, City of and Jane/John Doe(s)
Plaintiff: Roy A Call
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00133
Filed: April 29, 2013
 
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Dayton Office
County: MONTGOMERY
Presiding Judge: Thomas M Rose
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
November 5, 2013 11 Featured Case NOTICE TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF UPON FILING OF A MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS - You are hereby notified that the Defendants have filed a Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(c) motion for judgment on the pleadings in your case. This may result in the dismissal of s ome or all of your claims. You should receive a copy of the motion directly from the Defendants. Your response to this motion must be filed not later than twenty-four (24) days after the motion to dismiss was filed with the Court, i.e., on or before Monday, November 25, 2013. You must include a certificate that you have served your memorandum on all parties in the case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J Newman on 11/05/13. (pb1)
May 19, 2014 24 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS ORAL MOTION TO REQUIRE PLAINTIFF'S EXPERT WITNESS TO PREPARE A WRITTEN REPORT PURSUANT TO FED. R.CIV. P. 26(a)(2)(B). Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J Newman on 05/19/14. (pb1)
June 24, 2014 26 Featured Case ORDER OF DISMISSAL: TERMINATION ENTRY - IT IS ORDERED that this action is hereby DISMISSED, without prejudice, provided that any of the parties may, upon good cause shown within sixty (60) days, reopen the action if settlement is notconsummated. Signed by Judge Thomas M Rose on 6/24/14. (ep)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Call v. Riverside, City of et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Jackson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold Jones
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riverside, City of
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane/John Doe(s)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy A Call
Represented By: Charles E McFarland
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]