Aytch v. Commissioner of Social Security

Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Everett Aytch
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00135
Filed: April 30, 2013
 
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Dayton Office
County: MONTGOMERY
Referring Judge: Michael J Newman
Presiding Judge: Walter H Rice
 
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 19, 2014 14 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION THAT: (1) THE ALJ'S NON-DISABILITY FINDING BE FOUND UNSUPPORTED BY SUBSTANTIAL EVIDENCE, AND REVERSED; (2) THIS MATTER BE REMANDED TO THE COMMISSIONER UNDER THE FOURTH SENTENCE OF 42 U.S.C. § 405(g) FOR PROCEEDINGS CONSISTENT WITH THIS OPINION; AND (3) THIS CASE BE CLOSED re 2 Complaint filed by Everett Aytch Objections to R&R due by 9/5/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J Newman on 8/19/2014. (srb1)
September 8, 2014 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 14 Report and Recommendations,. Signed by Judge Walter H Rice on 9/8/2014. (srb1)
September 8, 2014 16 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT with attached Notice of Disposal. Signed on 09/08/14. (pb1)
July 24, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING MANAGEMENT OF SOCIAL SECURITY CASES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J Newman on 7/24/2013. (kje1)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Aytch v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: John J. Stark
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Everett Aytch
Represented By: Steven Barry Horenstein
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]